Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 971 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2045 Week
» 27406 Month
» 260326 Year
» 1925702 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41232 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 08/1949
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/08/1965
Service Life 16 yrs , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1949
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 27/08/1949
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 08/10/1955
6E   Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
84H   Wellington 4w/e 27/02/1960
2L   Leamington w/e 08/02/1964
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 14/11/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 21/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 2L Leamington 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 21/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41232
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
08/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
14/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
21/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 41232    
12/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev