Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4047 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17453 Week
» 70469 Month
» 189996 Year
» 3216849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41235 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 08/1949 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/11/1962 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/08/1949 |
Crewe Works (Paint Shop) |
21/8: New construction here was as follows: North Shed Nos. 41230/31/33; all have the crest (a smaller version than hitherto) on the tank sides. Nos. 41230/31 were due to go 'light' on 22/8 to Bangor and Denbigh respectively (No. 41231 had been working in and around the Birmingham area the previous week); Paint Shop Nos. 41234/35 and 41236 outside; Erecting Shop Nos. 41237 (complete), 41238 (almost complete with tanks), 41239 (frames and cylinders set up, boiler in separate bay, not yet mounted); Yard No. 41240 (frames and cylinders only). No. 48288 (ex W.D. 70403) was being repaired while W.D. Nos. 70438, 70584/99 were in the Works' yard. Locomotives in the new green livery included Nos. 45566/78/89, 45615, 46153/61. Scrap Road: On the cutting up road were Nos. 8948 an 9597, while No. 6004 was actually being cut up. Nos. 25297 an 25752 were over in the Carriage Shed marked 'Not to be cut up' |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41235 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
17/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
05/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41235 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|