Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 29 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2104 Week
» 27465 Month
» 260385 Year
» 1925761 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41241 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 09/1949
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/12/1966
Service Life 17 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1949
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 12/06/1958
82F   Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 04/10/1958
84H   Wellington 4w/e 31/10/1959
2L   Leamington w/e 01/02/1964
2M   Wellington w/e 13/06/1964
6H   Bangor w/e 20/06/1964
6C   Croes Newydd w/e 25/07/1964
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 12/06/1965
10G   Skipton w/e 21/08/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 10/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 84H Wellington 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 2L Leamington 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 6H Bangor 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 10G Skipton 5w/e 11/09/1965
WDN   w/e 10/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/10/1959 Wellington MPD Ivatt 2-6-2T 41201 (86K), lately stored at Newport Pill has been transferred here and is at present working the Crewe line (stabling overnight at the former GW depot at Gresty Lane); a further arrival is 41241 ex 82F. 9000 class 9004/14 are in store here-the other three of the class are also stored, viz., 9015/7 at Aberystwyth and 9018 at Oswestry. SLS/195912
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41241
Built at Crewe Works
   
12/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
31/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (84H)    
01/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wellington (2M)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
21/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Skipton (10G)    
10/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41241    

prev prev