Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 876 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14282 Week
» 67298 Month
» 186825 Year
» 3213678 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41244 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1949 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/11/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41244 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
13/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (7D) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
01/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (6H) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
25/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41244 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|