Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2086 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19889 Week
» 72905 Month
» 192432 Year
» 3219285 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41280 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1950 to Fleetwood (28B) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/12/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41280 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Fleetwood (28B) |
|
|
19/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blackpool Central (24E) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (24G) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bedford (14E) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
14/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
08/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41280 |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|