Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 23 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 841 Week
» 17792 Month
» 170745 Year
» 1836121 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41282 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 10/1950 to Fleetwood (28B)
Withdrawal w/e Mon 18/11/1963
Service Life 13 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
28B   Fleetwood (New) m/e 10/1950
26F   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 11/09/1954
20C   Royston 4w/e 03/12/1955
50B   Neville Hill w/e 20/06/1959
55C   Farnley Junction w/e 05/05/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 28B Fleetwood w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 02/10/1954
LOAN 20C Royston 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 20C Royston 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 55C Farnley Junction 5w/e 05/05/1962
WDN   w/e 18/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41282
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Fleetwood (28B)
   
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
05/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C)    
18/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 41282    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev