Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 339 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2040 Week
» 10155 Month
» 137598 Year
» 1802974 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41283 m/e 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 11/1950 to Wakefield (25A)
Withdrawal 3w/e Sat 12/03/1966
Service Life 15 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
25A   Wakefield (New) m/e 11/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 11/08/1951
27B   Aintree w/e 15/09/1951
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 01/12/1956
27B   Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
27A   Bank Hall 4w/e 18/05/1957
24F   Fleetwood 4w/e 10/08/1957
26F   Patricroft w/e 12/12/1959
75A   Brighton w/e 24/06/1961
72E   Barnstaple Junction on 24/03/1963
83E   Yeovil Town 6w/e 12/10/1964
83G   Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 11/07/1965
     Withdrawn 3w/e 12/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 25A Wakefield w/e 04/11/1950
LOAN 27B Aintree w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 15/09/1951
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 6w/e 06/07/1961
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 01/04/1963
LOAN 72E Barnstaple Junction 4w/e 06/04/1963
ALLOC 83E Yeovil Town 3w/e 05/10/1964
ALLOC 83G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   3w/e 12/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41283
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Wakefield (25A)
   
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
24/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Yeovil Town (83E)    
11/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Templecombe (S&D) (83G)    
12/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41283    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev