Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 5307 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20919 Week
» 119564 Month
» 322228 Year
» 3349081 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41294 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 10/1951 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 04/09/1966 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/10/1951 |
Brighton Works |
32021 an 32393 (both condemned) were outside works on 12th Oct.; the latter has since left for Ashford. New B.R. standard tank 80019 out 13th October. It is understood that 2-6-2T 41291 is at Tunbridge Wells and works on the 'Cuckoo' line: 41292-4 are at Stewart's Lane. While 377s is under repair at Brighton, her place has been taken by 32670 (still green, with plain tanks). |
SLS/195111 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41294 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
12/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E) |
|
|
01/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
25/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41294 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|