|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/11/1961 | Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 41301 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
||
15/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
10/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
25/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Guildford (70C) | ||
08/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G) | ||
10/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 41301 | ||
03/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |