Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 338 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2039 Week
» 10154 Month
» 137597 Year
» 1802973 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41304 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1952 to Faversham (73E)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 19/11/1966
Service Life 14 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
73E   Faversham (New) m/e 03/1952
71A   Eastleigh 9w/e 30/06/1952
74B   Ramsgate 6w/e 15/06/1956
71J   Highbridge 6w/e 01/04/1957
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/05/1959
82A   Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 16/07/1960
82E   Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 13/08/1960
89A   Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/07/1963
89A   Shrewsbury on 11/08/1963
8K   Bank Hall w/e 07/08/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 22/10/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 19/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71J Highbridge 9w/e 01/04/1957
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 16/07/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 5w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 4w/e 07/08/1965
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 19/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1960 Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. SLS/196004

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41304
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Faversham (73E)
   
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Highbridge (71J)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
11/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
22/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
19/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 41304    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev