|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/06/1952 | Brighton Works | No. 80039 left the Works on 18th inst. and engines under repair included the two main line diesels, diesel shunters, and standard Wainwright classes C and H as well as the usual Brighton types. No. 32401 came out freshly painted and lined on 20th, still with the 2-dome boiler. New Class 2 2-6-2T Nos. 41313-41316 and 41318 have been noted, the first three being located here. Unusual visitors today are 'B1' 61138 from Cambridge and Class '5MT' 45071 on through excursions. No. 2573 0-6-2T, whose number had almost disappeared from the bunker sides, has had the figures repainted (at the shed, presumbably) but has not been renumbered. No. 2560 is undergoing thorough overhaul in the Works and will come out as 32560. | SLS/195208 |
30/06/1952 | Southern Miscellany | New standard Class '4' 2-6-4Ts for service elsewhere continue to be completed at Brighton and run in from the shed there, including journeys on the evening through train to Tonbridge and back, Nos. 80036-9 being recently noted. New Crewe-built Class '2' 2-6-2Ts numbered 41310-2 allocated to Faversham are the first of the type to operate in East Kent. In addition to Sheerness branch and associated short main line trips they also work to Dover. Nos. 41313-5 commenced running from Brighton to Lewes, Eastbourne, and etc., during June when Nos. 41316-7 were expected soon to be ready as part of the allocation of the last four to Eastbourne which may include duties from St. Leonards. There is an 'E' Class Wainwright 4-4-0 still carrying Southern Railway number preceded by an 's'-s1491 stationed at Redhill at the time of writing. For several days it operated the through Tonbridge-Eastbourne turn in place of the Class '2' Eastbourne L.M.R. tank, also running to Reading and Tonbridge or Ashford. The other two remaining un-rebuilt 'Es' work from Faversham and Gillingham, the latter including duty 225 running from Tonbridge to Redhill, then after an interval to Reading and back. There is also Guildford duty 225 (Western Section) to be found on the Redhill-Reading line, a Drummond L.S.W.R. 4-4-0 turn. 'U' Class 2-6-0s have been noted working through from Andover to Cheltenham, M.S.W. Junction route, also together with S.R. 0-6-0s through Reading to Oxford or Banbury. Two lined black 'E3' 0-6-2Ts really belonging to a Goods Class are Nos. 32166, 32459. On June 7th, the advance portion of the Birkenhead-Hastings train was hauled by Atlantic No. 32422, North Foreland, which made a fast run with nine coaches from Redhill to Brighton (having been to Kensington,. Olympia, in the morning on the up relief routed via High Wycombe); 'L' Class 4-4-0, 31769 Brighton-Eastbourne; standard 2-6-4T, 80017 on to Hastings which worked goods back to Polegate at night. Atlantics will no doubt play a valuable part in haulage of summer trains to and from Brighton and Newhaven again this summer. One sometimes goes up light early on Saturday mornings from Newhaven to haul a relief boat express back from Victoria. Continental freight trains often formed to a considerable extent with braked, dual fitted Italian or similar European waggons are run several times daily each way between Dover and Southwark Depot or other London yard with timings occupying 2½-3 hr. according to route with a service stop, loaded or empty, with not less than one-third fully braked. 'King Arthur' locomotives are often employed. Their maximum load via Tonbridge is 425 tons; with light Pacifics, 500 tons; 'N' Class Mogul, 400 and so on. On account of the severity of grading, loads are reduced if Chatham or Maidstone (East) routes used. A light Pacific has been turned at Eastbourne Shed though only with difficulty. |
SLS/195208 |
28/10/1959 | Eastleigh Works (On Works) | On Works:- 30028/505/14/38/803/64, 32650/4037/83, 35013/6/25/6/8, 41314/2081, 73028/84, 84021/3, E5005, 20003. Waiting works:- 30055/104/783, 34026/62/6, 35012/5, 42076, 75079; ex-Works:- 30667, 30844, 34044, 35014. | SLS/195912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1952 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 41314 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
||
30/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) | ||
11/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
17/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) | ||
25/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) | ||
12/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E) | ||
01/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brighton (75A) | ||
25/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) | ||
07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 41314 | ||
03/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |