Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 284 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1985 Week
» 10100 Month
» 137543 Year
» 1802919 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41322 m/e 02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1952 to Warrington Dallam (8B)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
8B   Warrington Dallam (New) m/e 02/1952
2C   Warwick 4w/e 06/11/1954
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 01/01/1955
6H   Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 21/05/1955
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 16/06/1956
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 11/08/1956
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 15/11/1958
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/10/1959
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 21/01/1961
72A   Exmouth Junction w/e 16/09/1961
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 8B Warrington Dallam on 01/03/1952
LOAN 2C Warwick 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 22/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41322
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)
   
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
21/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41322    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev