Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 266 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1967 Week
» 10082 Month
» 137525 Year
» 1802901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 41323 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 03/1952 to Warrington Dallam (8B)
Withdrawal During 07/1964
Service Life 12 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
8B   Warrington Dallam (New) m/e 03/1952
6H   Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
6H   Bangor 8w/e 16/07/1955
11E   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 05/11/1955
6H   Bangor 4w/e 21/04/1956
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 16/06/1956
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 11/08/1956
6G   Llandudno Junction w/e 15/11/1958
6D   Chester Northgate w/e 25/07/1959
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 09/01/1960
72A   Exmouth Junction w/e 16/09/1961
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 8B Warrington Dallam on 08/03/1952
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 26/02/1955
LOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 11E Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 29/11/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region 4w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   w/e 22/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1959 Chester Northgate MPD Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1952 To Service To service as British Railways Number 41323
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)
   
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (11E)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 41323    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev