Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1873 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15279 Week
» 68295 Month
» 187822 Year
» 3214675 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
41328 |
m/e |
05/1952 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
During 05/1952 to Wellingborough (15A) |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1964 |
Service Life |
12 yrs , 2 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1960 |
Southport MPD |
Ivatt 2-6-2Ts 41277/328, stored at Buxton since Tutbury branch closure (June, 1960), are in use as station pilots displacing L & Y 2-4-2Ts, 50746/850, which have been placed in store. |
SLS/196103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 41328 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
14/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southport (27C) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
07/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 41328 |
|
|
12/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|