Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 862 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1936 Week
» 27297 Month
» 260217 Year
» 1925593 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2300 on 09/12/1927
British Railways 42300 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 09/12/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/11/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 09/12/1927
14C   St Albans on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14B   Kentish Town w/e 06/02/1960
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 20/02/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 26/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 26/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/01/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. SLS/196102
13/03/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/12/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2300
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (14C)    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42300    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
26/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 42300    
04/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev