Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 828 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1902 Week
» 27263 Month
» 260183 Year
» 1925559 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2301 on 20/12/1927
British Railways 42301 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/12/1927
Withdrawal Sat 19/10/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/12/1927
11D   Oxenholme on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 22/10/1960
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 29/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 19/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 06/05/1961
WDN   w/e 19/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 14/10/50:-40585 27A, 40910 9E, 41057 17A, 41060 17A, 41080 20E, 1846 16A, 42301 11D, 42414 25B, 3058 (58204) 19C, 3274 9D, 43615 8B, 43885 18B, 43911 21A, 44408 16A, 44599 17B, 45594 19B. New Construction: 12077 in Paint Shop and 12078-80 complete on 9/10; 42052 on trials 29/9 and 42053 9/10; 42054/5 complete, 42056 almost complete and frames for next two down, 9/10; frames for the next diesel (d12081) are also laid down. Ex Works: 41062, 41154, 43914, 44598, 64980, 58209, 64962, 40351, 41068, 41006, 47548, 42353, 43456, 47481. No. 10800 was on test run on 29/9, and 10800 was standing outside the diesel shop on 9/10. SLS/195012
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/12/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2301
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Oxenholme (11D)    
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42301    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
19/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42301    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev