Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2303 on 30/12/1927
British Railways 42303 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/12/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/12/1927
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2B   Bletchley w/e 13/11/1948
5D   Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 16/06/1956
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 23/02/1957
6D   Chester Northgate 4w/e 10/08/1957
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/01/1960
8E   Northwich w/e 13/08/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 22/03/1947
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911
31/10/1959 Chester Northgate MPD Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/12/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2303
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42303    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (2B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42303    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev