Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 304 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5704 Week
» 23756 Month
» 256676 Year
» 1922052 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2306 on 19/01/1928
British Railways 42306 w/e 25/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 19/01/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 27/02/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 19/01/1928
9D   Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 22/06/1946
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003
28/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. SLS/195004
16/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. SLS/196202
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. SLS/196204
18/02/1963 Derby Works (Works Yard) Diesel Erecting Shop: D70/1, D82, D104, D116/7, D120, D138, D5013/25/7/76/85, D5144/86. Test House: D114/39, D5187. Diesel Finishing Shop: D6, D99, D5189/90/1. Paint Shop: D105 D3085, D5188. Erecting Shop-No. 1 bay: 47447/53, 48370, 73013/45/156, 75049/51, D109, D3056, ED6, ED7; Erecting Shop-No. 2 bay: D108, D2387, D3245/372, D5075/87; Erecting Shop-No. 3 bay: D5192-D5207 new construction. Works Yard: 40031, 42306/14, 42472, 42500, 43958, 44394, 47302/4, D42, D52/8, D64, D68, D80, D96, D107, D118, D3248, D3863, D5018, ED3. Stored outside Works office: 10000, 10201/2/3. SLS/196303

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/01/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2306
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
25/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42306    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42306    
27/02/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev