Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 858 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1932 Week
» 27293 Month
» 260213 Year
» 1925589 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2307 on 26/01/1928
British Railways 42307 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Thu 26/01/1928
Withdrawal Thu 27/07/1961 (At Derby Works)
Withdrawal Notes At Derby Works
Service Life 33 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/01/1928
4B   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
87H   Neyland 4w/e 16/07/1955
87K   Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/11/1955
87E   Landore 4w/e 05/09/1959
87D   Swansea East Dock 4w/e 17/06/1961
     Withdrawn on 27/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) m/e 30/11/1955
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 17/06/1961
WDN   m/e 31/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/10/1945 Swansea Paxton Street MPD Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. SLS/194601
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
09/06/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop-44028 I, 44092 G, 44211 G, 44588 G, D3772 New. Tender for 41000. No. 2835/1902 (3500 galls). Diesel Erecting Shop-ED4, ED5, 10202, 12034/53/54/56/62. New Work 8 D-E Sh. D3773-D3780 new. Test House-D1, D3491. Diesel Finishing Shop-D2, D5019, D5700/1. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay-42400 I, 43920 I, 44229 G, 47259 I, 47623 G, 48170 G, 48184 G, 48185 I, 48192 G, 48215 G, 48420 G, 48643 I, 48690 G, 48700 G, 73033 G, 73138 I, Stripping-42305/7, 42818, 44213. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay-41000 (complete, ready for paint shop), 44202 I, 45057 Casual, 45275 Casual, 48191 I, 80062 I ; Stripping - 48180. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay-5 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D/E (D3-D7); 8 Bo-Bo, 1160 H.P. D/E (D5020-D5027). Yard-40047, 40413, 40420, 40550, 40680, 42354, 43223, 43873, 43939, 43970, 44597, 45128, 47309, 47538, 48356, 48385, 53806 Frames, 58279, 10100, 10800, 13084, D5018, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195907
15/05/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D10, D214, D2903/12, D3069/88, D3172, D5022, 11114/6, 13119. Test House: D3, D9, D21, D31, D77, D223/69, D3245, D5034, 11119, 12052. New Building: D33-D43. Finishing Shop: D32, D94, D268, D5029/31/75/85. Erecting Shop: 42102, 42337, 42410, 44053/85, 44132, 44269, 44526/62, 47384/98, 47493, 47506/59, 48142/80, 48313, 48643/54/71, 73011/33/53/66, 73132, 75045. Paint Shop: D30, 42281, 47305/24, 48385, 48401. Ex Works on Shed: D2501, D2910, 42077, 42377, 47646, 483361 48639, 73157, 75043. In Works Sidings: D11, D3017, D5018/61/84/90, D5143, D8013, 12000/33, 41529/36, 41835, 42088, 42307, 42507/17/29, 43888, 43911/62/91, 44067, 44124, 47357, 47605, 58850, 73127, 75011. SLS/196106
14/06/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D3, D8, D268, D2503, D2912, D3017, D5022/91, 11114, 12033/52. Diesel Test House: D27, D35, D215, D5031/2/4/85, D8013. New Shunter Test House: D3119. New Building: D38-D42, D44-D45, D47, D49. Finishing Shop: D36, D37. D43, D72, D5018/90. Erecting Shop: D2501, D3181, 12069, 42070/5/88, 42529, 43918/28, 44295, 44597, 47201, 47655, 48006, 48140, 48182, 48333/64, 48407, 48645/99, 48750, 73128, 75037/40/58. New Paint Shop: D34, MR 1000, 44045, 44533, 48748. In Works Sidings:-D11, D75, D77. D84, D92, D223, D306, D3058, D5061, D5139, 13122, 41529, 41835, 42307/37, 42506/7/10, 43846, 43911/21/47, 44132/3, 44333/62, 44520, 47393, 47418, 48177, 48351, 58850, 73014. SLS/196107
12/07/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings ) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
14/08/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/01/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2307
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42307    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
27/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42307    
10/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev