Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 286 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1987 Week
» 10102 Month
» 137545 Year
» 1802921 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2309 on 03/02/1928
British Railways 42309 w/e 09/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 03/02/1928
Withdrawal Sat 26/09/1964
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 03/02/1928
5A   Crewe North on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5E   Alsager w/e 24/12/1949
5E   Alsager 3w/e 14/01/1950
5A   Crewe North w/e 04/03/1950
5C   Stafford w/e 30/09/1950
5C   Stafford 4w/e 07/10/1950
6H   Bangor w/e 23/06/1962
9G   Gorton w/e 26/10/1963
10A   Carnforth w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 26/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 28/06/1947
LOAN 2A Rugby w/e 20/11/1948
EXLOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 5E Alsager w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 5C Stafford w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 6H Bangor 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   w/e 26/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/02/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2309
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Crewe North (5A)    
09/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42309    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Alsager (5E)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Alsager (5E)    
04/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (6H)    
26/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
26/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42309    
01/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev