Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 771 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1845 Week
» 27206 Month
» 260126 Year
» 1925502 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2310 on 10/02/1928
British Railways 42310 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Fri 10/02/1928
Withdrawal w/e Fri 08/03/1963
Service Life 35 yrs , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/02/1928
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 08/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 23/11/1946
WDN   on 08/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003
01/07/1950 Derby Works Engines into works: 1672, 41903, 42310, 3361, 43446, 4007, 44024, 44190, 44230, 44362, 4521, 7233, 47256, 7280, 7365, 12068, 53802, 53804, 58036. 58234, 64765, 64962, 2097. SLS/195008
01/05/1958 Derby Works (stripping section) 1st May. G-General repair, I-Intermediate Repair, L-Lined out. Paint Shop-118 (for cleaning up, fitting motion, etc.), D3509 (new), 12038 I, 44003 G, 44224 I, 44470 I, 48096 G, 47582 G, 73029 GL. Diesel Erecting Shop-E.D.2, D2508 (ex 11147), 10201 casual, 10202 attention to tyres, 12001/95, 13059. New Loco. Construction-D3510 (no. 8) (on test), D3511/2/3/4 (nos. 9, 10, 11, 12), D3515/7 (nos. 13/5) frames set up, D3522/3 (nos. 20/1).- Outside-East end, 11120, ED4 attention to crank pins; West end, 10100 cracked no. 1 AEC auxiliary engine cylinder block; test house, 10203. Erecting Shop no. 1 bay, 40580 G, 40681 G, 41900G, 42349 G, 42452 I, 42540 G, 43913 I, 44605 G, 48362 I, 48510 G, 48772 I, 80047 G, 80050 I; stripping section-42310 G, 48273 G, 48447 I; Erecting Shop no. 2 bay-42527 I, 43885 I, 44416 G, 44534 I; stripping-44561 G; frames only-D3516 (no. 14), D3518/9/20/1 (nos. 16/7/8/9) of Lot D658; Erecting Shop no. 3 bay-(new work, main line diesel) Lot B251, nos. 1-7, (Bo-Bo), (D5000-6). No Sulzer engine finally in position yet. No. 1 (D1 on welding jig), 1-Co-Co-1. Yard-40047, 40447 (submitted for cut-up from Crewe), 40680, 41066 (Exam.), 41086 (cut-up), 41980 (Exam.), 43332 (Exam.), 47004 G, 47218 I, 47290 G, 47488 I, 53800 (waiting cyls.), 73072, 75019. SLS/195805
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
17/12/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-44418 cut up, D2395, D3181, D4106/34. D5384, 12005/31/66, ED5; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D69, D75, D83, D5007/19/23/78, D5142, D5382/402, 10001; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-D5244-57 new. Erecting Shop: D1, D40/4, D84/6, D93, D102/10/23/31/45, D3126. Test House: D76, D106/21/38, D150, D3082, D5236/8/40/1/2. Paint Shop: D1698, D5239, 12059. Finishing Shop: D65, D101/18, D5237/43. Klondyke: D155, D5197/235, ED4. Foundry Row: 42310, 42500, 43977, 44085, 44530, 47496, D47, D2220, D3122. Stone Pit: D5233. Stored: 10000, 10201-3. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/02/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2310
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
26/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42310    
08/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42310    
01/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev