Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 886 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1960 Week
» 27321 Month
» 260241 Year
» 1925617 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2312 on 23/02/1928
British Railways 42312 w/e 23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/02/1928
Withdrawal Sat 14/11/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/02/1928
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 23/11/1946
WDN   on 10/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/10/1950 Derby Works For shops W/E 28/10/50:-12058 18A, 40065 26A, 40433 7D, 41044 15D, 41049 17D, 41053 15C, 41166 8E, 41167 5A, 41193 27A, 42312 25B, 42402 11B, 43294 18D, 3748 15C, 3932 22B, 44176 21A, 47160 6C, 7235 19A, 47591 8B, 64787 30F. No. 40433 is for special examination, which may mean withdrawal. SLS/195012
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/02/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2312
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
23/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42312    
14/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 42312    
03/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev