Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2315 on 10/03/1928
British Railways 42315 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 10/03/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/03/1928
9D   Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 22/06/1946
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 17/07/1951
5D   Stoke 4w/e 06/10/1956
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 03/11/1956
1A   Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
14D   Neasden 4w/e 22/03/1958
1A   Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1958
5D   Stoke 4w/e 14/06/1958
1A   Willesden w/e 17/12/1960
5D   Stoke w/e 31/12/1960
24L   Carnforth w/e 07/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 6A Chester (MR) w/e 30/06/1951
EXLOAN 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 22/03/1958
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/12/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42527 I, 47616 G, 48326 G, 80082 G, D3801, D5066 (New). Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12093/7, D3053, D5705/16, D8209. New Work: D3802, D3937-41, Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026, D5068-70. Test House: D9, D5067. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42315 G, 42413 G, 42629 G, 43903 G, 44248/334/368 I, 44444 G, 44514 G, 44580 I, 44596 G, 47547 I, 48009 G, 48097/146/386/446 G, 48543 I, 48716 G, 73045 I, 75058 I, 80086 G. Stripping: 43809/999. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay: 44235/429 I, 73013/127 I, 75052 I, 80141 I. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: 7 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E (D5071-7) D8, 3 1-Co-Co-1, 2300 H.P. D-E (D10-D12). Yard: 40413/680/925, 41975, 42312/54/61/507, 43370, 43531/665/759/998, 44140/50/274/326/79, 47299/309/482, 48205, 58190, 73129/32, 75054, 10100/800, D2/5, D2910, D5014, D5718, D8002. SLS/196001
14/01/1960 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay) Paint Shop: M.R.1000, 43911 I, 44274 G, 48097 G, 48205 I, 75054 I. Diesel Erecting Shop: ED4/6, 12097/8, 13090, D5004, D8209. New Work: 6 D-E Sh., 0-6-0 (D3937-D3942). Test House: D5068/9/70. Diesel Finishing Shop: D7/10, D5016/71/2. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay: 42394 G, 42502/13 G, 43342/682 I, 44098/381 G, 47377/429/45 G, 48181 I, 48355 G, 48382/436 I, 48607 G, 75051/61/4 I, Str., 48338/545. Erecting Shop, No. 2.Bay: 42315 G, 42533 I, 44160 I, 73133/4 (Cas.) Str., 42293, 43832. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay: D1, 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E (D5073-81). 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E (D11-D14). Yard: 40413. 41763, 42354, 43370, 43531/828, 47309/67, 48387/424, 10100/800, D4/5/6/9, D5014. SLS/196002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/03/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2315
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42315    
17/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42315    
07/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev