Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 46 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4961 Week
» 16198 Month
» 249118 Year
» 1914494 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2316 on 14/03/1928
British Railways 42316 w/e 20/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 14/03/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/02/1963
Service Life 34 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 14/03/1928
1A   Willesden on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 30/01/1954
2C   Warwick 4w/e 21/04/1956
1A   Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
14D   Neasden 4w/e 22/03/1958
1A   Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1958
9B   Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 12/07/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 16/02/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 1A Willesden m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN NEA Neasden on 19/08/1949
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region on 25/08/1949
EXLOAN 1A Willesden w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 2C Warwick 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 9A Longsight 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 22/03/1958
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 12/07/1958
WDN   w/e 16/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
14/03/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2316
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
20/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42316    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Warwick (2C)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
19/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
16/02/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42316    
08/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev