Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5656 Week
» 23708 Month
» 256628 Year
» 1922004 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2317 on 22/03/1928
British Railways 42317 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Mon 22/03/1928
Withdrawal Mon 23/08/1965
Service Life 37 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/03/1928
11D   Oxenholme on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6D   Chester Northgate w/e 17/10/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/01/1960
12C   Carlisle Canal w/e 06/05/1961
12H   Tebay w/e 04/11/1961
55G   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 09/12/1961
     Withdrawn on 23/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6D Chester Northgate 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 12H Tebay 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   on 23/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1951 Derby Works During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. SLS/195109
31/10/1959 Chester Northgate MPD Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. SLS/196003
13/03/1961 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED2, D3, D232, D2501/8, D2909/10, D3052, D3126, D3778, D8006, 10203, 11116, 12077, 13119. Test House: ED4, D16, D79, D213/21, D5092, 12000. New Building: D9, D25-D33. Finishing Shop: D23/4, D5090, D5133, 10202. Erecting Shop: 42067, 42500/27, 44376, 47202/97, 47313, 47415/30, 47577, 47612/40, 48000/24/81, 48133, 48216, 48607/17/44, 48728, 53806, 75033/9/50/9, 92129. Paint Shop: D22, M1000, 42221, 42317, 43885, 44542, 48351. In Works Sidings: D210, D3172, D5065/72, 40695, 41536, 42134, 42300/67, 42414, 43306, 43574, 44480, 47204, 47312/8/47/72, 47408/39, 47507, 48063, 48121/43, 48153, 48219, 48690, 58850. Ex Works Shed: 10000, 42211, 42391, 42508, 44085, 44264, 44581, 47416, 48701, 75016. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/03/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2317
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Oxenholme (11D)    
29/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42317    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Chester Northgate (6D)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C)    
04/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12H)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
23/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42317    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev