Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 255 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5655 Week
» 23707 Month
» 256627 Year
» 1922003 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2318 on 30/03/1928
British Railways 42318 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/03/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/09/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/03/1928
9D   Buxton (LNWR) on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A   Crewe North m/e 30/11/1950
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 02/12/1950
9C   Macclesfield 4w/e 29/12/1951
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 23/02/1952
9C   Macclesfield 4w/e 21/02/1953
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 08/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 08/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/03/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2318
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
27/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42318    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
08/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42318    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev