Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 281 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5681 Week
» 23733 Month
» 256653 Year
» 1922029 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2319 on 13/04/1928
British Railways 42319 w/e 11/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 13/04/1928
Withdrawal Sat 19/10/1963
Service Life 35 yrs, 6 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/04/1928
9C   Macclesfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9A   Longsight 4w/e 05/11/1955
9C   Macclesfield 8w/e 05/10/1957
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 22/03/1958
24L   Carnforth w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn on 19/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 19/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/01/1948 Derby Works Locomotives relettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' were Nos. M49, M2192, M2319, and M4291 on the shed, and M2520 In the Paint Shop. New construction in the Erecting Shop was 2193 (complete), 2194 (frames and cylinders; boiler not mounted), 2195/6 (frames and cylinders only). In the Diesel Shop were Nos. 7130/1, both practically complete, and 10000, which had returned for reinforcement of fuel tanks. The frames of No. 10001 were seen in the Heavy Machine Shop, but little progress has been made as yet SLS/194803
15/11/1963 Crewe Works (cut up) Paint Shop: 45494, 49395, D1031/72, 27004 and three Brush Type 4s (D1500 series). Paint Shop Yard: 44677, 45059, 45574, 48094/371/502/760, 73135, 75000, 82000, 92008, D221/49, D1030. Yard: 42668, 44500, 44676/86/762/892/904, 45139/263/280/317/736, 46119/43, 46227/31/2, 46452, 48411, 70025, 78028/62, 84013, 90630, 92068/81/178. Electric Loco. Shop: E3019, 26005/16/20, 27001/2. Outside Erecting Shop: 44696, 44726, 45072/137, 46489, 78013, 92071/109, D200/6/15, D374/81/95. Erecting Shop: 44671/712/33/59/858/927, 45013/25/106/293/403/29/34/7/91, 46434/7, 48472/725/31, 70045, 77002, 78033/55, 80105, 92013/153/68/74/82/234, D222/8/9/31/3/45/52/93/7, D303, D6769, D8001. Cut-up Shop: remains of 46158 remains. Locos. cut up at Crewe w/e 19/10: 42556/853, 45100/315, 46223, 49104; w/e 26/10-42238/79, 46224, 49408, 84012; w/e 2/11-45625/45, 46149/222/42; w/e 9/11-42157/288/319, 44309, 45521, 45706; w/e 16/11-42442, 45591, 46126/58/230/49. New construction comprised Brush Type 4s (D1500s), Western Type 4s (D1000s). SLS/196312

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/04/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2319
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
11/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42319    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
19/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42319    
11/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev