Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 841 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1915 Week
» 27276 Month
» 260196 Year
» 1925572 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2321 on 04/05/1928
British Railways 42321 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 04/05/1928
Withdrawal Sat 07/11/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/05/1928
11B   Barrow in Furness on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 03/12/1955
1A   Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 08/08/1959
1A   Willesden w/e 19/09/1959
     Withdrawn on 07/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/02/1958
EXLOAN 5D Stoke 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall 8w/e 05/09/1959
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 3w/e 26/09/1959
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/05/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2321
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Barrow in Furness (11B)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42321    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
19/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 42321    
08/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev