Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2323 on 04/06/1928
British Railways 42323 w/e 27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 04/06/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 23/06/1962
Service Life 34 yrs , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/06/1928
9C   Macclesfield 4w/e 22/06/1946
9C   Macclesfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
4A   Shrewsbury w/e 18/12/1948
5D   Stoke 3w/e 14/01/1950
91M   To London Midland Region 4w/e 20/05/1950
11B   Barrow in Furness 8w/e 11/07/1953
5D   Stoke 4w/e 08/08/1953
5C   Stafford 4w/e 20/04/1957
5D   Stoke w/e 22/11/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 23/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 9A Longsight 4w/e 27/04/1946
LOAN 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 14/01/1950
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 11/03/1950
EXLOAN 5D Stoke w/e 13/05/1950
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   w/e 23/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1951 Derby Works During the first half of July new 5MT 73000/5/6/7 went back into works for modification to drawgear; others were laid down up to 73012, also frames of diesel 12094. Into shops: 2159 (86G), 40011, 40472, 40508, 40629, 681, 40925, 41044, 41079, 41803/13, 41901, 42141, 42218 (33A), 42323, 42390 (87K), 43235/90, 43631, 43792 (71H), 43987, 44039, 44162, 44467, 44589, 45183 (84G), 47353, 47440/6, 47585, M7603, 47607, 58077, 22951, 64712/55 (39A), 64768 (30A). 40508, 41044 and 58077 were in for special examination. Where sheds are quoted, the locos. are other than L.M.R. stock. In works yard (withdrawn): 1781, 1856, 3617 (58296), 58237, 58302. Stored near station: 40411/6/26, 43312/68, 43469/96, 43574, 58163. Off works: 12015, 40012, 40396, 40402/44/86, 40583, 40935, 41078/87, 42141, 42218, 42317/84, 42411, 42525, 43218, 43331, 43787, 43907/76, 44102/23/34, 44268, 47266, 47357, 47547/89/95, 47611, 53810, 58040, 58300, 64796, 64887. Of these 40583, 42525:43907, 47357 and 53810 are still lettered L.M.S, and 40396 now has tall Stanier chimney in place of previous L.M.S. lipped pattern. SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2323
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
27/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42323    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
23/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42323    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev