Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2324 on 22/06/1928
British Railways 42324 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Wed 22/06/1928
Withdrawal Wed 14/11/1962
Service Life 34 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 22/06/1928
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield w/e 02/10/1948
25C   Goole 4w/e 24/03/1956
56D   Mirfield 5w/e 14/06/1958
56F   Low Moor w/e 18/06/1960
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23C Southport w/e 26/07/1947
ALLOC 23C Southport w/e 23/08/1947
ALLOC 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 02/10/1948
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 3w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   on 14/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 31/3 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42140/41 were complete-No. 42140 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42142 had the frames and boiler erected and Nos. 42143/44 only the frames. Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 40419/86/95, 525/28, 40541, 628, 40633, 40910/35. 936, 41006/35/54/94, 41157/88/96/97, 41247, 1747, 1820, 42324, 2367/70/90, 42516/27/28, 3178/80, 3223/33, 3357/70/88, 3405, 3634/39, 43803/45, 3863, 43865/86, 43912, 3931/48/51, 43970, 3971, 4012/35/37, 44053, 4104, 44129, 4157/69, 44184/85, 44260, 44523, 4538, 44552/82, 4591, 45585, 7252, 22940, 58100, E.R. No. 8002, W.R. Nos. 2089, 2134/36. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40029, 40540, 40633, 41076. 41112, 42306/65, 58088. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41531. 41747, 41835. 43370, 43804, 44432/66, 47253, 47336, 47402/62, 47627/30, W.R. Nos. 2023, 2112, while Nos. 40015/34/47, 40937, 42346/92, 42405, 42507/12/25, 43180, 43223/28, 43605, 43863/67, 44053, 44104 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Nos. 58160 an 58299 appeared painted black, with plain tenders. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/2 Nos. 40533 an 1252: W/E 17/2 No. 1366. SLS/195004
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
17/10/1958 Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay) 17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/06/1928 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2324
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
02/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42324    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
14/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42324    
09/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev