Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 34 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4949 Week
» 16186 Month
» 249106 Year
» 1914482 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2326 on 29/01/1929
British Railways 42326 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 29/01/1929
Withdrawal Sat 02/07/1960
Service Life 31 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/01/1929
21A   Saltley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17A   Derby 8w/e 05/10/1957
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958
17A   Derby 4w/e 06/09/1958
18C   Hasland w/e 11/07/1959
9G   Gorton w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 02/07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 05/10/1957
LOAN 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958
EXLOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 18C Hasland 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   w/e 02/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders.
On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.'
Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12.
SLS/195001
30/11/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders.
On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.'
Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12.
SLS/195001
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/01/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2326
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Saltley (21A)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42326    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
02/07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 42326    
08/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev