Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 818 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1892 Week
» 27253 Month
» 260173 Year
» 1925549 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2327 on 02/02/1929
British Railways 42327 w/e 08/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 02/02/1929
Withdrawal Sat 28/08/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/02/1929
21B   Bournville 4w/e 22/06/1946
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21A   Saltley 8w/e 14/06/1952
15C   Leicester Midland 8w/e 19/06/1954
21A   Saltley 4w/e 14/08/1954
5C   Stafford w/e 20/08/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/06/1962
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 07/12/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 22/02/1964
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 29/05/1965
     Withdrawn on 28/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 16/08/1947
EXLOAN 21B Bournville w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 14/06/1952
LOAN 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 10/07/1954
EXLOAN 21A Saltley 4w/e 04/09/1954
ALLOC 5C Stafford 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 28/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006
17/08/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop-MR 1000, 44579, 48390; Diesel Erecting Shop-12047/95, 13084/118/9/72, D3771, ED4; New Work-11 D/E sh. 0-6-0, D3782-92 new; Test House-D2, D3781, D5021; Diesel Finishing shop- D3/4, D5008/22/3; Erecting Shop-No. 1 Bay, 42415I, 42517/36G, 44122I, 44172G, 44214G, 44279/377I, 44389/402 G, 44468I, 44472G, 48053/346/77/463G; Also, 42395, 44166/191, 80091stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 2 Bay-42393I, 44164I, 47453I, 75057I, 80144I, 73014stripping; Erecting Shop-No. 3 Bay-8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P.-D5024-31new, 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P, D5-D8new; Yard-40047/680, 42257/308/27/54/400/624, 43210/386/982, 44092/139/154/169, 45250, 47309, 48335/392/418, 48715 frames, 58213, 10000/203/800, D5020, D5700/17, Cecil Rakes. SLS/195909
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204
16/03/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D156/8/9, D2236, D2904, D5023/6/73, D5145, 42327/81, 42409, 43953, 44180, 47295, 47441/4, 47515, 48533. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2327
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
08/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42327    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
22/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
28/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42327    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev