Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 253 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5653 Week
» 23705 Month
» 256625 Year
» 1922001 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2331 on 25/02/1929
British Railways 42331 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 25/02/1929
Withdrawal Sat 01/09/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/02/1929
14B   Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 01/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14B Kentish Town w/e 29/11/1947
EXLOAN 15C Leicester Midland w/e 10/01/1948
WDN   w/e 01/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 23003, 40036, 40362, 40471, 485, 40504, 538/43/51/65, 671, 40690, 40910, 917/28, 41005/12/19/53/71/72/90, 1120, 41144, 1153, 41194, 1198, 1420/24, 1531, 1671, 41804, 42314/22/26/31, 2359, 42363, 2408, 42501/06/09/22/33, 3045, 3192/94, 43200, 3204, 43281, 43374, 3427, 3596, 3604/18/78, 3798, 3873, 43933, 3980, 4133/34, 4213/46, 46120, 48223, 10001. New work: On 30/11 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42128-30 were complete, No. 42129 being in the Paint Shop, while on the same day No. 42131 had the frames and cylinders erected and No, 42132 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12064/65 were complete, while No. 12066 was nearly complete. On 25/11 No. 42326 was being fitted with outside steam pipes. No. 40548 was the first locomotive at Derby Works to receive the crest, being painted black and fully lined; Nos. 41006 an 58068 were the first of their respective classes to be dealt with in the same manner. Further locomotives to be painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40008/69, 40489, 41901, 42519. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos, 41754, 43933, 44227/46, 47266, Nos. 58124/79 appeared painted black, with plain tenders.
On 30/11 Nos. 40005 an 41090 were ex Works not repainted and still bearing 'L.M.S.'
Nos. 456/79, 40740, 41923, 2107, 9546, 9639 an 20216 were cut up during the three W/E 24/12.
SLS/195001
02/01/1960 Northampton-Market Harborough Northampton-Market Harborough last trains on 2nd January-Market Harborough used Fowler 42331 (15C) and Northampton used Ivatt 41218; latter took 6 coaches on the 8-33 p.m. from Northampton but failed at Market Harborough making the 9-30 p.m. ex latter one hour late leaving. 42331 (15C) hauled the train back from Market Harborough. SLS/196002
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
30/12/1961 Leicester to Rugby last day Owing to the very bad weather on 30th December (which spread to the Home Counties the next day) very few people were travelling. In the morning 42062 an 46446 were working passenger traffic while 48363/6 were noted on freight duties with 92030 on a diverted Toton-Willesden goods. The last official goods, Leicester-Rugby, was the 10-58 a.m. Toton-Sudbury Junc. which entered the branch at Wigston at 2 p.m. with 48311 (55B). Following this came 42331 on the Leicester Society's special. The 2-55 p.m. Leicester-Rugby had 42361 and this returned on the 4-20 p.m. from Rugby which was followed by the return of daily 'pick-up' (2-45 p.m. ex Rugby) worked by 43028-the last goods on the branch. The 5.3 p.m. Leicester-Rugby was hauled by 46446 and the 5-45 p.m. Leicester -Rugby by 42062 which formed the 7-28 p.m. ex Rugby and 9-40 p.m. ex Leicester, the last trains each way. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2331
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kentish Town (14B)    
26/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42331    
01/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42331    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev