Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 765 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1839 Week
» 27200 Month
» 260120 Year
» 1925496 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2332 m/e 03/1929
British Railways 42332 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 03/1929
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1929
9B   Stockport Edgeley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 28/01/1956
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/10/1950 Derby Works For Works: W/E 21/10/50, 40405 5C, 40505 71H, 40522 8E, 40743 20A, 41123 7A, 42184 16A, 42332 9B, 42374 33A, 42521 33D, 43212 18C, 44166 17B, 4267 22A, 44524 21A, 7096 1A, 7441 15C, 47469 23C, 20155 16A, 23006 3E, 58247 17C, (W) 2107 84F, 64834 32B, 64958 30A. The most interesting items are 40743 for intermediate repair, and 20155 (the last 2-4-0-Midland-for special examination which usually means condemnation).
New construction: 42054 on trials 18/10, 42055/6 completed, 42057-60 in various stages; 12078 in paint shop 18/10, 12079-81 complete, 12082-4 in various stages.
Ex works 40532/655, 41004/67, 42509/22, 42325, 47410, 64721/37/57, 64956/80 (W/E 18/10), 40584, 41001/60, 41153/65/81, 41833, 42345, 43586, 43992, 47340, 47674, 64883 (W/E 25/10).
Cut up: 15-18/10/50. Nos. 1251 an 1406 (old Nos.). No. 58236, in paint shop 18/10 with R/T boiler.
Stored: 407, 40418/513/556/632, 43342/64, 3368, 43482, 43200. (25/10).
SLS/195012
14/11/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-2 bay) 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, SLS/195812
13/04/1960 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 42500 G, 75053 I, D3952/3 New, D5114 New, D5713 Casual. Diesel Erecting Shop:-10001 G, 12045/70/6/99, 13118, D2901/8, D8004, 4 D.E. Sh. 0-6-0. Erecting Shop, No. 1 Bay:-42099 G, 42219/389/406/520 G, 42556 I, 47578 G, 48027/64/673 I, 48696 G 48704 G, 75012/19 I. No. 1 Bay Stripping:- 42213/311, 44289. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay:- 44270 Casual, 9 0-6-0 D.E. Sh. No. 2 Bay Stripping:- 44133, 48403, 73004. Erecting Shop, No. 3 Bay:- D5003 Casual 3 1.Co-Co.1 2300 H.P. D.E., 8 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D.E. (D5118 etc.) Test House:- 10202, D2220, D3955/7, D5117, D8012. Diesel Finishing Shop:- D214, D5014 Casual, D5115/6. Yard:- 40070, 40633, 42211, 42301/20/8/31/2/53/62/417/48, 43314, 43637, 44209/406/515, 47326/96, 47400 Frames, 48100/661, 75036/54, M.R. 1000 Cecil Raikes, D10, D3015, D5716/18, ED6, 10100, 10800. SLS/196005
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Bone Yard) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
05/11/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: 12000, 42332, 42404, 43368, 43826, 43905/75, 44033, 44581, 47268, 47529, 47666, Cecil Raikes. Gasworks Siding: 44263, 47472. Erecting Shop: D3015/22, 12054/68/84, 12100, 13123, 41804, 42421, 42503, 43593, 43620, 44130, 44241, 44401, 44560, 47298, 47521, 48009, 48110/85/92, 48304/80, 48467, 58850, 73073, 73156/8, 75030/52. Diesel Finishing Shop: D89, D140/2/3, D8017/37. Diesel Test House: D141, D211/26. Outside Diesel Test House: D43, D80, D2501. New Erecting Shop: D144-54. Diesel Shunter Test House: 13122. Paint Shop: M.R.1000. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2908/9, D5024, D5143, 10202/3, 11145. Outside Diesel Repair Shop: D2504, 11118. Shed Road: 41168, 42328, 42510/21/4, 43295. SLS/196112
15/12/1961 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. SLS/196201
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
25/02/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: D2506, D3124, D5035/73/5/80/6, ED3, 12000/63, 42332/75, 47003, 47218, 47353, 47404/44/73/5, 48533, 58214, 73130, 75035. Gasworks : Nil, Roundhouse: M.R. 118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. New Paint Shop: D157, M.R. 1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650, 48081. Diesel Test House: D158. Outside Diesel Test House: 12051. Diesel Finishing Shop: D38, D159/60, D5081/2, D5145. New Erecting Shop: D161-70. Erecting Shop: D2213, D3052, D3578, D3843, 13117, 42078, 42327/43/81, 43953, 44112, 44279, 44304/87, 44416, 47165, 47293/5, 47325, 47441, 47515, 47653, 48105/8, 48609, 48763, 75048. Diesel Repair Shop: D10/98/9, D122/9, D2236, D2864, D2904/12, D5018/23/6/76, D5142/6, ED1, Shed Road: 41168, 42363, 42448, Awaiting Works: 42409, 47483, 47643. SLS/196204
16/03/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. SLS/196204
06/04/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. SLS/196205
07/05/1962 Derby Works (Bone Yard) Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D63, D70, D84, D105, D168, D3117, D5028/88. Test House: D166/7, 13306, Midland Pullman coaches Nos. u60091/2, u60732/42. Shunter test house: D3067. New Building: D171-D180. Finishing Shop: D81, D169/170, 10203. Erecting Shop: D2504/8, D3019/68, D3368, 13051, 13120, 42071, 42178, 43949, 44210/33/44, 44571, 47004, 47228, 48098, 48386, 53808, 73053, 73140/58. Paint Shop: MR1000, 48687 (15D). 'Stone Pit': 48183, 73039. 'Foundry Row': 41168, 42099, 42352, 43263, 43410/35, 47340/66. 'Bone Yard': 42332. 'Klondyke Sidings': ED1, 12000, 42069, 42283, 43985, 44154, 44561, 44583, 48381. Shop Road: 44049/92, 48261/72, 68030. Works Shunt: D2377, D3168.
EXPLANATORY NOTES-Stone Pit: Track adjoining Diesel Finishing Shop. Foundry Row: Name explains itself. Bone Yard: Dump opposite station adjoining main Works Offices. Klondyke: Works arrival sidings between new Paint Shop and Test House.
SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2332
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42332    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42332    
08/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev