Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 310 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5710 Week
» 23762 Month
» 256682 Year
» 1922058 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2334 on 12/03/1929
British Railways 42334 w/e 11/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 12/03/1929
Withdrawal Sat 25/12/1965
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 12/03/1929
15C   Leicester Midland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14C   St Albans w/e 31/01/1948
21B   Bournville 4w/e 04/12/1954
14D   Neasden 4w/e 17/05/1958
14B   Kentish Town w/e 01/11/1958
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 19/05/1962
9G   Gorton w/e 22/06/1963
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 12/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 25/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 26/07/1947
EXLOAN 15C Leicester Midland w/e 06/09/1947
ALLOC 14C St Albans w/e 31/01/1948
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 25/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
04/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on 17A Shed: D3174, 12088, 12101, 42334, 43963/71, 44179, 44605, 47279, 47343/9/75, 47664/75/80, 48008, 48775. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/03/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2334
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Leicester Midland (15C)    
31/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
11/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42334    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
25/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42334    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev