Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2335 on 20/03/1929
British Railways 42335 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 20/03/1929
Withdrawal Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 35 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 20/03/1929
14C   St Albans on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 07/11/1959
14B   Kentish Town w/e 06/02/1960
17C   Rowsley w/e 07/07/1962
17A   Derby w/e 13/10/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 18/05/1963
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 14C St Albans w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 25/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1951 Derby Works During the second half of January new construction comprised some work on Nos. 73000/1, the cylinders of the former being positioned. No. 10100 has been outside the diesel shop for some days. Condemned locos. in the Works yard: 40370, 41012, 41824 (from W.R.), also the N.L. Crane 58865. No. 22853 was still in Works, not cut up, on 26/1. In store near the station: 43429 (17C), and 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361 (17A), all 17A. Engines from other Regions under repair: 42328, 42506/23, 58043 (33A), 42394 (87K), 44518 (35C), 64728 (40A), 64751, 64911 (37A), 64987 (36C). Most engines now leave shops with the B.R. emblem, but 42371 an 47473 have come off lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS, while tenders so lettered are attached to 43757, 44576 an 58265. Engines off shops with tanks or tenders lettered L.M.S. are 42335, 41101, 43395, 44002/15: apparently Derby has a lingering affection for this lettering, which became obsolete three years ago!! W2043 has come off without emblem, but with W prefix under the numberplate. No. 58071, lined with emblem, is freshly out still with round-topped firebox. Several J.39 class have come off shops, 64793, 64910/79 (repainted with emblem) and 64714 (renumbered-with emblem-but not repainted). Un-renumbered engines in shops include 326 (20A), 580 (27D), 7295 (12A), 7339 (11A), 7391 (12A). No. 326 is the last of the S. & D.J. engines to get its B.R. number, which will be its fourth: originally No. 69, it became 43 in 1928, and 326 in March 1930. Latterly it has been working in the Leeds area. SLS/195103
14/04/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint shop, 40672 G, 44376 G, 44553 G, 47285 I, D3763/4 New. Diesel erecting shop, 10202, 12092, 13085, D2221 (Old no. 11127), D5714, ED4/5. New work, D3765-D3772 0-6-0 D.E. shunters. Test house, D5015. Diesel Loco. finishing shop, D1 Scafell Pike, D5016 New. Erecting shop, No. 1 bay, 42522 G, 44070 I, 44576 G, 47362 G, 47448 I, 47629 I, 48001 G, 48225 I, 48304 I, 48653 G, 73032 G, 75016 I, 75018 G, 75045 G. Stripping, 44569, 48007, 48128. Erecting shop, No. 2 bay 41000 General, new cylinders, two frame inserts over driving horns, 42402 I, 43991 I, 44420 I, 47611 I, 48081 I, 53804 I. Erecting shop, No. 3 bay 7 Bo-Bo D-E. 1160 H.P. (D5017-D5023) 5 1-Co.-Co.-1 D-E. 2300 H.P. (D2-D6). Yard, 40047, 40680, 41165, 42335, 42354, 43292, 43324, 43629, 47309, 48033, 48133, 48186, 48197, 48374, 48380, 48405, 58085, 58308, 73140, 10100, 10800, D3124 Cecil Raikes. Stored, 40925. SLS/195905
28/11/1959 Woodford MPD Woodford have received three Fowler 2-6-4Ts (42335/6/49) to replace the Lls 67789 an 67740. SLS/196001
04/02/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Roundhouse: M.R.118/58A, Cecil Raikes, Thundersley. Erecting Shop: 13117, 13292, 42078, 42322/35/84, 42400/9, 43295, 44112/76, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 47461/99, 47543/65, 47631, 48149, 48355/67, 48678, 75019/46/8. New Paint Shop: D154/5, M.R.1000. Outside New Paint Shop: L.N.W.R, 2650. Diesel Finishing Shop: D72/9, D111/56/7. New Erecting Shop: D158-67. Works Sidings: D10/84, D128, D5142, ED1, 12000, 42306/30, 43679, 44165, 44241, 47003, 47516, 47678, 58214, 75035. Gasworks Siding: Nil. Diesel Test House: D5016. Outside Diesel Test House: D123, D2198, D2221. Diesel Shunter Test House: Nil. Diesel Repair Shop: D2, D122, D2213/20, D2395, D2904, D5018/9/75/7, 11155. Works Shunter: 47325. Shed road: 41168, 42328/63/8/95, 42404/48, 47218. E SLS/196203
25/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. SLS/196204
10/08/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D48, D104, D132, D179, D5000/80, 10001. Outside Diesel Erecting Shop: ED3, D5, D178, D3125, D5017. Test House: D90, D122, D176, D5018, Pullman Coach No. uM60090. Shunter Test House: D3121. New Building: D183-D192. Finishing Shop: D68, D108, D180-D182, D5022. Erecting Shop: D2386, D3117/77, 12054, 42240/7, 42335, 42413, 44321, 44575, 48000, 48132, 48673, 48759, 73161/5. Paint Shop: D177, MR1000. Outside Paint Shop: 43994. 'Stone Pit': 73159, 75063. 'Foundry Row': 42069, 42500, 43216, 43682, 44122, 73131. 'Klondyke Sidings' : D58, D87, D96, D5014/28, D5134, 10201/3, 73137 (frames only). SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/03/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2335
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - St Albans (14C)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42335    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42335    
06/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev