Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 840 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1914 Week
» 27275 Month
» 260195 Year
» 1925571 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2336 on 06/04/1929
British Railways 42336 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Thu 06/04/1929
Withdrawal Thu 18/10/1962 off Kentish Town (14B)
Service Life 33 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 21/06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/04/1929
17B   Burton on 08/02/1947
14C   St Albans (on loan) on 25/11/1949
17B   Burton on 29/12/1949
17A   Derby on 14/12/1952
17A   Derby 4w/e 27/12/1952
16A   Nottingham on 25/04/1955
18C   Hasland (on loan) on 16/04/1958
18C   Hasland on 19/05/1958
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) on 09/06/1958
18C   Hasland on 13/07/1959
     Stored on 28/09/1959
18C   Hasland (Reinstated) on 19/10/1959
14C   St Albans on 23/10/1959
2F   Woodford Halse on 07/11/1959
14B   Kentish Town on 01/02/1960
16A   Nottingham (on loan) on 08/09/1960
14B   Kentish Town on 02/11/1960
     Stored on 26/06/1961
14B   Kentish Town (Reinstated) on 29/01/1962
17C   Rowsley on 02/07/1962
14B   Kentish Town on 16/09/1962
     Withdrawn on 18/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 14C St Albans w/e 26/11/1949
EXLOAN 17B Burton w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 27/12/1952
LOAN 18C Hasland 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 18C Hasland 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 18C Hasland 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 14C St Albans 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/01/1960
LOAN 16A Nottingham 4w/e 24/09/1960
EXLOAN 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 29/10/1960
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 20/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/04/1950 Derby Works New work: On 28/4 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42142/43 were complete-No. 42142 being in the Paint Shop-No. 42144 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42145 only the frames. New diesel No. 12069 was complete. The frames were erected for the first two of a batch of new 2-6-4T's for the Ulster Transport Authority. Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 10000, 12023, 15100, 40417, 453, 40484, 502/03, 40516, 557, 40658. 659, 40926, 930, 41014/44/52, 1073, 41075/91/97, 1118/50, 41166/95, 1303, 1727, 1855, 42305/07/34/36, 2348, 42360/86/97, 2407, 42413, 42505/11/18/32/33/35, 3090, 3187, 43228, 3254, 3379, 43388/89, 43482, 3507/22/50/95/98, 3773, 3810/32/52, 43870/79. 43940, 3962, 4005/92, 4153, 44176, 4273, 44275, 4289, 44298, 44403/12/25, 4532/63, 44570, 4578, 44584, 44667, 13807, 58041, 58198, 22913, ED1, W.R. Nos. 2039, 2186. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40056, 40628, 41035, 42324/90, 58056, 58100 (ex 2290). In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41532, 41820/55, 43370, 43639, 43773/91, 43970, 44012, 44260/89, 44532/38/70, 47212/53/89, 47308/50, 47436, 47525/65, 47626/30/54, W.R. No. 2134, while Nos. 40453/95, 40502/25/28/57, 40659, 41054, 41118/57/96, 42336, 42516/28, 43178/87, 43232/33/54/88, 43379/88/89, 43845, 44005/37, 44169/76, 44563, 47524/32, 47638, 58198 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' W.R. No. 2089 has been painted green and lettered 'British Railways.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 10/3 Nos. 3477, 3533, 22940; W/E 31/3 Nos, 40745, 1895, 3772, 22976. SLS/195005
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808
28/11/1959 Woodford MPD Woodford have received three Fowler 2-6-4Ts (42335/6/49) to replace the Lls 67789 an 67740. SLS/196001

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2336
Built at Derby Works
   
08/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
05/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42336    
25/11/1949 Allocation Loaned to St Albans (14C)    
29/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
14/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
25/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
16/04/1958 Allocation Loaned to Hasland (18C)    
19/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
09/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
13/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
28/09/1959 To Store To Store    
19/10/1959 Reinstated Reinstated to Hasland (18C)    
23/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
01/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
08/09/1960 Allocation Loaned to Nottingham (16A)    
02/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
26/06/1961 To Store To Store    
29/01/1962 Reinstated Reinstated to Kentish Town (14B)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
18/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42336 from Kentish Town (14B)    
21/06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev