Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2338 on 02/04/1929
British Railways 42338 w/e 15/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 02/04/1929
Withdrawal Sat 11/01/1964
Service Life 34 yrs, 9 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/04/1929
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14D   Neasden 4w/e 17/05/1958
14B   Kentish Town w/e 01/11/1958
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 26/05/1962
9G   Gorton w/e 29/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 11/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21B Bournville m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 21B Bournville 5w/e 02/03/1946
LOAN 16A Nottingham w/e 15/03/1947
EXLOAN 21B Bournville w/e 03/05/1947
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 02/06/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 11/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/04/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2338
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
15/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42338    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
26/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
11/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42338    
03/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev