Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 889 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1963 Week
» 27324 Month
» 260244 Year
» 1925620 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2339 on 06/04/1929
British Railways 42339 w/e 10/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/04/1929
Withdrawal Sat 28/09/1963
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/04/1929
21B   Bournville 4w/e 22/06/1946
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16A   Nottingham w/e 08/05/1948
16D   Annesley w/e 10/01/1959
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 23/01/1960
27F   Brunswick w/e 24/12/1960
9E   Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 11/04/1961
17A   Derby w/e 09/12/1961
14B   Kentish Town w/e 10/02/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 07/07/1962
17A   Derby w/e 13/10/1962
17C   Rowsley w/e 18/05/1963
26C   Bolton w/e 22/06/1963
     Withdrawn on 28/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 16A Nottingham w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 16D Annesley 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/01/1960
LOAN 27F Brunswick 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 17C Rowsley 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 26C Bolton 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 28/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1945 Wellingborough During the last two weeks in December, there were numerous strangers in this area, helping with the Christmas workings when some expresses ran in as many as six parts-an unprecedented occurrence on the Midland Division. Locos noted included 324, 931 (20B); 1181 (19A), 2339 (21A), 2814 (2D), 4017 (19C), 4843 (22A), 4916, 5070 (1A), 5381 (5A), 5403 (5A), 5410 (8A), 5657 (22A), 8127 (20A), 8162 (20C), 8373 (4A). 2129, 2518 (13D), and 7312 (13B) have been seen working through light en route for shops. W.D. tanks 71473 an 71535 were dead in the loco yard on 23/12, but disappeared next day. SLS/194604
15/09/1950 Derby Works For works during first half of September: 40653 4B, 41050/9 14B, 41065 23C, 41118 8E, 42325 14B, 42533 33A, 43754 22B, 43959 18C, 43968 and M4010 21A, 44164 an 44402 17A, 44174 17D, 7588 5C, 7635 22B, 58137 16C, 64883 40A, 40410 35C, 41062 19B, 41068 20A, 1251 (58034) 22B, 42339 16A, 42344 5D, 42345 5C, 43246 an 43435 21A, 43344 22B, 3650 18A, 43819 18A, 43925 20D, 44180 17C, 44355 22A, 7481 87K, 22945 (58136) 20B, 58237 20C, 64757 38A, 64959 32A, 40001 11A, 40351 20A, 426 17A, 41001 22B, 41004 20E, 41006 15C, 41067 20E, 41095 15C, 41154 9E, 1429 (58090) 20C, 42364 5D, 42509 33C, 42512 33C, 3456 20A, 3914 18D, 44598 16A, 47548 19A, 58209 19B, 64798 38E.
New Construction: No. 42050 was ex Paint Shop on 6/9, and others up to 42057 were in various stages in the Erecting Shop. Diesels 12074/5 were completed and others up to 12079 in course of construction. No. 42146 was on trials on 6/9. Nos. 404, 40411/6 have gone into traffic ex store, but Nos. 407, 40513, 43342/64, 43482 are in store, near the station.
Withdrawn: still in works Yard: 40498, 40515, 41017, 43297, 43818, 22853 (58112), 3511 (58275), 1251 (58034) and 1406 (58079). No. 41748 is ex Works, with round-top firebox. No. 58080 (0-4-4T) has appeared fully lined, with emblem. Among those repainted black with emblem are 2108 (0-6-OPT), and J.39 Nos. 64762/5/84/97, 64903/62/9, while 64906/51 still retain BRITISH RAILWAYS (not repainted).
SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/04/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2339
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
08/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
10/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42339    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (27F)    
11/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E)    
09/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
13/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rowsley (17C)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
28/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42339    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev