Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 880 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1954 Week
» 27315 Month
» 260235 Year
» 1925611 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2340 on 11/04/1929
British Railways 42340 w/e 16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 11/04/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 09/06/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 11/04/1929
17A   Derby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
21B   Bournville 8w/e 16/07/1955
21A   Saltley 4w/e 12/07/1958
8E   Northwich w/e 20/08/1960
9C   Macclesfield w/e 17/09/1960
8E   Northwich w/e 05/11/1960
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 09/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 21A Saltley w/e 03/05/1947
ALLOC 17A Derby w/e 21/06/1947
ALLOC 21B Bournville 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 21A Saltley 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 27/08/1960
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC SE   5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 09/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/06/1950 Derby Works Engines into works: 60, 40063, 656, 41043, 41064, 1341, 41535, 41904, 42340, 42377, 43203, 43310, 3511, 4179, 44241, 44555, 58070, 64784, 64841, 64797, 64903 and pannier tank 2070. A number of J.39's are now shopped at Derby. Ex works in lined black with emblem 40007, 40409, 40586, 41117: un-lined ditto 47292, 47305, 47432, 43521, 43960, 44136, 43657, 12024, 2182 (pannier tank), 41779 (retaining R.T. Firebox and Salter safety-valves), still lettered L.M.S. 40700, 41078, 43978, 58240 (retaining round-topped firebox and Salter safety-valves). Cut up between 31/5/50 and 16/6/50: 40516, 2096 (Tilbury Tank), 3805 (3F). New Construction: Ulster Transport Authority Nos. 54 and 55 completed; 56 boiler fitted; 57 frames only. B.R. 42145 completed; 42146 frames only; 12069/70 ex works. Running trials: 10800 0-4-4-0 Diesel, N.B. Loco. Co. 26413/50; Davey-Paxman Diesel engine, electrical equipment by B.T.H. Co. SLS/195008
15/07/1950 Derby Works (Works Yard) 42146 almost complete; UTA.56 complete and painted; UTA.57 nearly complete. First two sets of frames in position for order No. 4310. Nos. 404, 40411/6, 43364 in store near station, joined a fortnight later by 43342 an 43482. Fresh off Works: 47000, 2035, 43900/61 repainted with emblem; 42503, 43985, 44007, 44200, 47233, 58075, 58234 lettered L.M.S.; 40656, 40925, 41064/96, 42377/93 lined black, with emblem; 40671 'British Railways'; 42311 unlined. In Paint Shop 58054 (ex 1341) with emblem. For shops W/E 15/7/50: 434, 40535, 41051, 41168, 1889, 42351/3, 42406, 3101, 43690, 43892/98, 44112/72, 7342, 58224, 64722, 64951, 4969. Still in Works Yard at end of July: 22853, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 58036, 58229 (condemned). 24/7/50: Ex Works: 2070 still lettered G.W.R. 64827 repainted with emblem; 64903, tender lettered L.N.E.R.; 42503 lettered L.M.S. 30/7/50: 42146, UTA.56/57, Order 4310 as on 13th. Nos. 12070/1 complete, 12072/3 almost complete; 10800 in Diesel shop; 41060 lined with 'British Railways' on tender; 41181 has tender unlined with emblem; 42340 lined black with emblem. SLS/195010
11/02/1960 Derby Works (Stripping) Paint Shop-MR1000, 42293 I, 42513 I, 44223 I, 48079 I. Diesel Erecting Shop-10000, 12074/5/98, 13173, D2220, D2901, D8012, ED4/6. New Work-6 diesel shunters D3937-3942 New. Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay -42053 I, 42152 I, 42372 G, 43903 I, 43967 G, 44203/7 I, 44222 G, 44509 I, 47287 G, 47469 G, 47596 G, 47648 I, 48187 G, 48413/7 G, 73070 G, 75038 I, 80092 G. Stripping-42340, 42516, 43410; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay: 8 d/e shunters D3943-49/51, 42540 Casual, 42396 Stripping; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-10100 Cut, D5014 Damage repairs, 10 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. d/e (D5075-84), 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. d/e. Test House-D10, D5072. Diesel Finishing Shop-D5015, D5073/4, D5716. Yard-40025, 40413/582/654, 42387, 43256/428/510/31/665/759, 43933/7/95, 44158/344/55/510, 47238, 47609, 48098/9, 58219/61, 92135, D4, D5, D6. SLS/196003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/04/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2340
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42340    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bournville (21B)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
20/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
09/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42340    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev