Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 297 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5697 Week
» 23749 Month
» 256669 Year
» 1922045 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2341 on 16/04/1929
British Railways 42341 w/e 21/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 16/04/1929
Withdrawal Sat 17/10/1959
Service Life 30 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 16/04/1929
17A   Derby 4w/e 22/06/1946
17A   Derby on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
14C   St Albans w/e 31/03/1951
14C   St Albans 4w/e 19/05/1951
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 13A Plaistow 4w/e 10/11/1945
LOAN 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/03/1946
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 29/03/1947
LOAN 14B Kentish Town w/e 14/08/1948
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 18/09/1948
LOAN 20E Manningham w/e 05/03/1949
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 30/04/1949
ALLOC 14C St Albans w/e 31/03/1951
WDN   w/e 17/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Derby Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 40324/95, 430, 40459, 634, 40741, 41094, 41113/66/74/81/88, 1682, 1768, 1847/59, 42310, 2341/80, 42412, 42512/23/24/28/29, 42680, 3140/44, 3244, 3323/36/64, 3431, 3509, 43524, 3529/94, 3658, 3723/37, 3847, 43917, 3926/44/50, 43964/95, 4054, 4106, 44172/97, 44217, 4252, 44529, 4536/80, 44598, 4601. New work: On 30/12 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42132/33 were complete, while No. 42134 had the frames and boiler erected. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with crest, were Nos. 40010/36, 40362, 40504/51/65, 40917, 42408, 58083. The following also carry the crest: Nos. 41671, 43194, 43798, 43928, 47296, 47480, 47554, 47604 and ex-G.W.R. Nos. 2050, 2160 while Nos. 40928, 41053, 41120, 42326, 42509/33, 47634 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' No. 40741, unlined and lettered 'British Railways,' was on Works' trials on 30/12.
Withdrawn locomotives: On 30/12 No. 7058 was in the Works' yard, and No. 9588 had arrived for cutting up. Nos. 1247 and 3264 were cut up during W/E 24/12 and 31/12 respectively. Ex-G.W.R. No. 2137 was also cut up here during December.
SLS/195002
23/02/1950 Derby Works New work: On 23/2 new 2-6-4T's Nos. 42137-39 were complete-No, 42137 being in the Paint Shop-No, 42140 had the frames and cylinders erected and No. 42141 only the frames. New diesels Nos. 12067/68 were complete, while No. 12067 was noted in the Paint Shop-painted, with crest. Locomotives entering Works during: january: These included Nos. 40046, 49, 40322, 436, 490, 512, 40518/33, 540, 40553/59, 40601, 698, 40927, 937, 1043, 41057/76/81, 1112, 41114, 1252, 1425, 41532, 1686, 1711/20/26, 1835, 41873, 2306, 42320/46, 2365, 42392, 42405, 42504/07/13/25, 3228, 43329, 3429/53/94, 3605/20/55/60, 3714/24, 3804/13/30/67, 44017/47, 44131, 44262, 4423, 44466, 4468, 44482, 4522, 4557/81, 4820, 45305, 48205, 13806, 22984, W.R. No. 2112. On 5/1 No. 42363 was noted in the Paint Shop, fitted with outside steam pipes. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40045, 40163, 40553, 40634, 40917, 41094, 41166/74/88, 42310/63. In addition, the following also carry the crest: Nos. 41682, 41711, 41859, 43431, 43524, 43658/60, 43714/23, 43917/50/64, 44423, 44601, 47409/21/99, 47528/51, 47623/31, while Nos. 40059, 40395, 40518, 40698, 41043, 41533, 41686, 42341/59/80, 42524/28, 43228, 43724, 43847, 43944, 47241, 47438, 53806 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: W/E 6/1 No. 40459; W/E 13/1 Nos. 1768, 7058, 9588; W/E 20/1 No.2100; W/E 27/1 No. 3813. Nos, 490, 512, an 3830 were also cut up during January, while No. 9573 was in the process of being cut up on 27/1. SLS/195003
08/07/1950 Derby Works Observations (22/6) U.T.A. 54 ready for despatch, 55 completed, 56 and 57 under construction. (29/6) 56 completed. (6/7) 57 almost finished. New 2-6-4T 42145 in paint shop (22/6): 42146 almost ready (6/7). Diesel-electric shunters 12069/70 complete on 22/6, 12071 to follow. Being cut up (22/6) 727, 41039, 3173: already cut up 58041, 58082. In store near station 404, 40411, 40416, 43364 (22/6 to 6/7). Repainted with emblem: 43861, 44313, 58127, 12035, 44050, 47282, 44338, 43310, 47207, 44132, 44558, 47672, 44179, 58293, 43356; also with lining 42348, 42350, 40053, 40694, 41063, 42399, 40931, 41064. Off works: 40631 (plain tender); lettered L.M.S., 43490, 43575, 44559, 41079, 41100, 42341, 43203, 43267, 44241, 44559, 58070, 44174, 40060, 40063, 41016, 43399, 58189 (tender cab). Lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS: 44030, 40055, 41074 (tall chimney); also with lining 42304, 40055. In works yard (22/6-6/7): 40556, 58036, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 22853. 10800 was on trial, on 22/6 with dynamometer car and six bogies, and a week later on test run with dynamometer car and five bogies-Derby-Leicester-Manchester-Derby. The first set of frames for No. 1 of Order 4310 (? 2-6-0) were set up early' in July.
46100 is now 'Taper Scot' green livery, with smoke deflectors, number on smokebox door, no bell, and the large nameplates which were put on the old engine after her return from U.S.A. (These are not correct for the engine as it is now). 46210 is the first of its class to be painted blue, and is in traffic. 58394 (ex 28509) has come off works and so escaped the melting-pot for a time.
SLS/195008
15/10/1959 Derby Works (Yard) Paint Shop: M.R. 1000, 42512 (I), 42624 (G), 47598 (G), 48001 (I), 48218 (G), 48293 (I), D3791 New, D5025 New. Diesel Erecting Shop: 10203, 11126, 12036, 13038. New Work: 9 D-E. Sh. D3792-D3800new. Test House: D6, D3789/90. Diesel Finishing Shop: D5026/7/8, D4. Erecting Shop; No. 1 Bay; 42314 (G), 42403 (I), 42405 (I), 42422 (G), 42506 (I), 42523 (I), 42537 (G), 43914 (I), 44333 (I), 44435 (I), 44521 (I), 44557 (G), 47410 (G), 48004 (G), 73030 (I), 80093 (G). Stripping: 42311, 43865, 48674stripping. Erecting Shop; No. 2 Bay: 42227 (I), 42540 (G), 43949 (G), 44262 (G), 44267 casual, 44394 (G), 48331 (I), 75044 (I). Erecting Shop; No. 3 Bay: 9 Bo-Bo. 1160 H.P. D-E. D5029-37uc 5 1-Co-Co-1. 2300 H.P. D-E D7-11uc. Yard: 40047, 40412, 40513/36/50/680, 42303/13/41/54, 43292/308/587/826 860/86, 44214/402, 47309/433/584/632, 48050, 58065, 73159, 10000/800, 12094, D2/5, Cecil Raikes. SLS/195911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/04/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2341
Built at Derby Works
   
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Derby (17A)    
21/01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42341    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
19/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to St Albans (14C)    
17/10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 42341    
10/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev