Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 33 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4948 Week
» 16185 Month
» 249105 Year
» 1914481 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2342 on 23/04/1929
British Railways 42342 w/e 19/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/04/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/06/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/04/1929
21B   Bournville on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16C   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 30/09/1950
21A   Saltley 4w/e 06/10/1951
17A   Derby 4w/e 22/03/1952
17A   Derby 4w/e 19/04/1952
16A   Nottingham 4w/e 21/05/1955
14D   Neasden 4w/e 17/05/1958
14B   Kentish Town w/e 01/11/1958
     Withdrawn w/e 02/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 13A Plaistow w/e 30/08/1947
EXLOAN 21B Bournville w/e 08/11/1947
ALLOC 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 06/10/1951
LOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 14D Neasden 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 01/11/1958
WDN   w/e 02/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1951 Derby Works During the period ended 13/1/51, the following unrenumbered engines have appeared for Works: for special examination, 1377 (19B) and 530 (22B); for attention, 7236 (19A), 7502 (18D), 3392 (20B), 22944 (16A), 7165 (28B), 7572 (25A), 3679 (84G). Cut up, 20155 (14/12). New 2-6-4T on trial, 42065 . 10000, 10001 an 10800 were receiving attention in the diesel shop. Apart from the usual Derby types, the following were in evidence: 64714 (39A), 64730 (40A), 64832 (38A), 64967 (37A), 2043 (LYD), 64783 (30A), 64836 (37A), also the following 'outsiders'-42502 (33C), 42509/29/30 (33A), 43757 (84G), 47479 (87K), 40482 an 43957 (35C), 41824 (87K), 42506 (33A), 42385 (87K). The following came off still lettered 'British Railways'-42388, 64727, 41853 (round-top firebox), 47576, 42342, 41905 (lined); and others still 'L.M.S.' !! 41534, 44186, 41196, 42533, 40032, 47503, 44339, 40928, 42387, 42530, 43627, 44103 (after three years of British Railways). No. 10100 was on trial on 9/1/51, when 10000/1 were still in the diesel shop. The following are stored near the station: 407, 40418, 40513, 40632, 43200/59, 43361, 43429. Old engines fresh off works include 2053 and 2112 (0-6-0PT), 40454, 40463, 43627, 43790, 58062, 58159, 58162. Those repainted with emblem include 64734, 64805/41/93 an 43846 with a L.M.S. standard 0-8-0 tender. SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/04/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2342
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bournville (21B)    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42342    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
21/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
01/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
02/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42342    
07/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev