Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 237 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5637 Week
» 23689 Month
» 256609 Year
» 1921985 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2348 on 23/05/1929
British Railways 42348 w/e 19/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 23/05/1929
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 23/05/1929
5E   Alsager on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/01/1948
2B   Bletchley w/e 13/11/1948
5D   Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1951
9A   Longsight 4w/e 23/02/1957
9C   Macclesfield 8w/e 05/10/1957
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 10/06/1961
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5E Alsager 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC 2B Bletchley w/e 13/11/1948
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1950 Derby Works Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. SLS/195006
08/07/1950 Derby Works Observations (22/6) U.T.A. 54 ready for despatch, 55 completed, 56 and 57 under construction. (29/6) 56 completed. (6/7) 57 almost finished. New 2-6-4T 42145 in paint shop (22/6): 42146 almost ready (6/7). Diesel-electric shunters 12069/70 complete on 22/6, 12071 to follow. Being cut up (22/6) 727, 41039, 3173: already cut up 58041, 58082. In store near station 404, 40411, 40416, 43364 (22/6 to 6/7). Repainted with emblem: 43861, 44313, 58127, 12035, 44050, 47282, 44338, 43310, 47207, 44132, 44558, 47672, 44179, 58293, 43356; also with lining 42348, 42350, 40053, 40694, 41063, 42399, 40931, 41064. Off works: 40631 (plain tender); lettered L.M.S., 43490, 43575, 44559, 41079, 41100, 42341, 43203, 43267, 44241, 44559, 58070, 44174, 40060, 40063, 41016, 43399, 58189 (tender cab). Lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS: 44030, 40055, 41074 (tall chimney); also with lining 42304, 40055. In works yard (22/6-6/7): 40556, 58036, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 22853. 10800 was on trial, on 22/6 with dynamometer car and six bogies, and a week later on test run with dynamometer car and five bogies-Derby-Leicester-Manchester-Derby. The first set of frames for No. 1 of Order 4310 (? 2-6-0) were set up early' in July.
46100 is now 'Taper Scot' green livery, with smoke deflectors, number on smokebox door, no bell, and the large nameplates which were put on the old engine after her return from U.S.A. (These are not correct for the engine as it is now). 46210 is the first of its class to be painted blue, and is in traffic. 58394 (ex 28509) has come off works and so escaped the melting-pot for a time.
SLS/195008
03/07/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop no. 1 bay) Paint shop- 42310 G, 42530 I, 43991 I, 44044 G, 48056 G, 48419 I, 48644 G, D3529 (No. 27-new), D3530 (No. 28). Diesel erecting shop- 12066 G, 15004 Casual, D8015 Casual, new work (order no. D658) no. 29 (D3531) on test, nos. 30-39 (D3532-41) all engines mounted, nos. 46-50 (D3548-52) frames in stocks. Erecting shop (no. 2 bay)- 42308 I, 42528 G, 43514 G, 43822 G, 43906 I, 43932 I, 47535 I, 47660 I, 48694 G; Erecting shop (no. 1 bay)- 40010 G, 42336 G, 42348 G, 42373 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42391 G, 42541 G, 42680 I, 43459 I, 44288 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 75037 G, 75047 G, stripping- 42536 I, 47289 I, 47552 G; Erecting shop (no. 3 bay)-, new work Diesel main line-D5001-7 new (nos. 2-8) engines mounted on D5001-3; D1, D2 new (nos. 1 & 2) framework only. Yard- 40047, 40657, 40680, 42322, 42506/25/29, 44135/46/61, 44290, 47504, 53807, 58196, 75034, D8000, D5000. M.R. 118 has returned from Carlisle. SLS/195807
28/07/1958 Derby Works (Paint shop) 28th July. Paint shop-42348 I, 42391 G, 43459 I, 47434 G, 47660 I, 75037 G. Diesel Erecting shop-15000/4, D8015; new work order D658-nos. 34-42 (D3536-44), nos. 49-52 (D3551-4) frames only. Steam erecting shop, no. 1 bay- 40010 G, 42181 I, 42303 I, 42322 G, 42336 I, 42376 G, 42377 I, 42481 Casual, 42529, 42541 G, 47275, 47289 I, 47504 I, 47552 G, 48002 G, 48075 G, 48159 G, 48696 I and 75034 G; Steam erecting shop, no. 2 bay- 40657 I, 42308 I, 42369 G, 42528 G, 44146 Casual, 44288, 47333 G, 47470 G and 48694 I. Steam erecting shop, No. 3 bay- new work, main line diesel; Nos. 2-10 (D5001-9) Bo-Bo; D1 an D2 1-Co-Co-1. Works yard- 12066, 40047, 40680, 41106, 42525, 43356, 43997, 44046, 44135, 44161, 47309, 48024, 80044 an D3530. Test House- D5000; this returned from inspection on 24th July from Marylebone and is the first main line diesel-electric built at Derby under M. Plan-it is painted in B.R. green with grey roof and grey-green waist band about 1' thick around centre and B.R. crests below waist-bands at no. 2 cab end. 1160 h.p., Sulzer diesel engine, B.T.H. elec. equipment. SLS/195808

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/05/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2348
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Alsager (5E)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
13/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (2B)    
19/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42348    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Macclesfield (9C)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42348    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev