Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 243 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5643 Week
» 23695 Month
» 256615 Year
» 1921991 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2349 on 30/05/1929
British Railways 42349 w/e 11/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 30/05/1929
Withdrawal Sat 22/07/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 30/05/1929
9C   Macclesfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5C   Stafford w/e 07/02/1948
5D   Stoke 3w/e 11/12/1948
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 16/05/1953
18C   Hasland w/e 11/07/1959
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 07/11/1959
14B   Kentish Town w/e 06/02/1960
     Withdrawn on 22/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 9C Macclesfield w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 5C Stafford w/e 07/02/1948
LOAN 8E Brunswick 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 8E Brunswick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 18C Hasland 6w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 30/01/1960
WDN   w/e 22/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Central Wales Line (ex L.N.W.R.): For a considerable time the small sheds at Builth Road and Knighton have housed three 18' ex L.N.W.R. 0-6-0 'Cauliflowers,' one at the former and two at the latter; however, it now seems that the class has been displaced and the banking duties at each shed are performed by ex M.R. Class '3.F' 0-6-70's at Knighton, and whatever can be provided at Builth Road. During the week-end Sept. 20/21 2-6-4T 2349 (4A) and 2362 (4B) were outside the Builth Road shed (it is apparently too small for them to enter!) and during the week-end Sept. 27/28 3679 (4A) and 3581 (4A) were on Knighton shed. One of the Knighton locos. has a regular turn every other day to Craven Arms and back. SLS/194712
01/05/1958 Derby Works (Erecting Shop no. 1 bay) 1st May. G-General repair, I-Intermediate Repair, L-Lined out. Paint Shop-118 (for cleaning up, fitting motion, etc.), D3509 (new), 12038 I, 44003 G, 44224 I, 44470 I, 48096 G, 47582 G, 73029 GL. Diesel Erecting Shop-E.D.2, D2508 (ex 11147), 10201 casual, 10202 attention to tyres, 12001/95, 13059. New Loco. Construction-D3510 (no. 8) (on test), D3511/2/3/4 (nos. 9, 10, 11, 12), D3515/7 (nos. 13/5) frames set up, D3522/3 (nos. 20/1).- Outside-East end, 11120, ED4 attention to crank pins; West end, 10100 cracked no. 1 AEC auxiliary engine cylinder block; test house, 10203. Erecting Shop no. 1 bay, 40580 G, 40681 G, 41900G, 42349 G, 42452 I, 42540 G, 43913 I, 44605 G, 48362 I, 48510 G, 48772 I, 80047 G, 80050 I; stripping section-42310 G, 48273 G, 48447 I; Erecting Shop no. 2 bay-42527 I, 43885 I, 44416 G, 44534 I; stripping-44561 G; frames only-D3516 (no. 14), D3518/9/20/1 (nos. 16/7/8/9) of Lot D658; Erecting Shop no. 3 bay-(new work, main line diesel) Lot B251, nos. 1-7, (Bo-Bo), (D5000-6). No Sulzer engine finally in position yet. No. 1 (D1 on welding jig), 1-Co-Co-1. Yard-40047, 40447 (submitted for cut-up from Crewe), 40680, 41066 (Exam.), 41086 (cut-up), 41980 (Exam.), 43332 (Exam.), 47004 G, 47218 I, 47290 G, 47488 I, 53800 (waiting cyls.), 73072, 75019. SLS/195805
14/11/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop-1 bay) 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, SLS/195812
28/11/1959 Woodford MPD Woodford have received three Fowler 2-6-4Ts (42335/6/49) to replace the Lls 67789 an 67740. SLS/196001
12/07/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings ) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
14/08/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. SLS/196109
19/09/1961 Derby Works (In Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D99, D211, D2503, D2908, D5023/88, D5144, D8014, 11146, 13248. Diesel Test House: D1, D48, D90, D2913, D5075. New Building: D46, D139-D147. Finishing Shop: D21/2, D49, D93, D138, D8015. Erecting Shop: 12096, 13122/76, 41804, 42198, 42211, 42408, 43599, 43645, 43964, 44572, 47207, 47272, 47308/27, 47450/94, 47602/29, 48225/79, 53809, 73010/38/71, 73125/30, 75018/32. Paint Shop: D47, D100 (re-varnished and named Sherwood Forester). In Works Sidings: Cecil Raikes, D44, D2501, D2909, 10202/3, 12000, 41168, 42282, 42283, 42328/49/74, 42510/21/4/31, 43905, 47268, 47432, 47611, 48001, 58850, 75017/34. SLS/196110

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/05/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2349
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
11/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
11/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42349    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Hasland (18C)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kentish Town (14B)    
22/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42349    
12/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev