Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2350 on 04/06/1929
British Railways 42350 w/e 30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 04/06/1929
Withdrawal Sat 13/02/1965
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 04/06/1929
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
9D   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 20/10/1951
1A   Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 08/08/1959
1A   Willesden w/e 12/09/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 25/05/1963
6A   Chester (MR) w/e 20/07/1963
5C   Stafford w/e 20/06/1964
     Withdrawn on 13/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9A Longsight w/e 09/11/1946
LOAN 6A Chester (MR) w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 9D Buxton (LNWR) w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall 8w/e 05/09/1959
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 5C Stafford 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 13/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/07/1950 Derby Works Observations (22/6) U.T.A. 54 ready for despatch, 55 completed, 56 and 57 under construction. (29/6) 56 completed. (6/7) 57 almost finished. New 2-6-4T 42145 in paint shop (22/6): 42146 almost ready (6/7). Diesel-electric shunters 12069/70 complete on 22/6, 12071 to follow. Being cut up (22/6) 727, 41039, 3173: already cut up 58041, 58082. In store near station 404, 40411, 40416, 43364 (22/6 to 6/7). Repainted with emblem: 43861, 44313, 58127, 12035, 44050, 47282, 44338, 43310, 47207, 44132, 44558, 47672, 44179, 58293, 43356; also with lining 42348, 42350, 40053, 40694, 41063, 42399, 40931, 41064. Off works: 40631 (plain tender); lettered L.M.S., 43490, 43575, 44559, 41079, 41100, 42341, 43203, 43267, 44241, 44559, 58070, 44174, 40060, 40063, 41016, 43399, 58189 (tender cab). Lettered BRITISH RAILWAYS: 44030, 40055, 41074 (tall chimney); also with lining 42304, 40055. In works yard (22/6-6/7): 40556, 58036, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 22853. 10800 was on trial, on 22/6 with dynamometer car and six bogies, and a week later on test run with dynamometer car and five bogies-Derby-Leicester-Manchester-Derby. The first set of frames for No. 1 of Order 4310 (? 2-6-0) were set up early' in July.
46100 is now 'Taper Scot' green livery, with smoke deflectors, number on smokebox door, no bell, and the large nameplates which were put on the old engine after her return from U.S.A. (These are not correct for the engine as it is now). 46210 is the first of its class to be painted blue, and is in traffic. 58394 (ex 28509) has come off works and so escaped the melting-pot for a time.
SLS/195008
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912
16/03/1962 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. SLS/196204
06/04/1962 Derby Works (Paint Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D1, D3, D72, D90, D105, D2506, D2912, D3124, D3859, D5020/2/30/76/86/9/91/2. Test House: D162, D2908, D5029/88, D5136, 10203. New Building: D167-D176. Finishing Shop: D69, D74, D165/6, D5028, D5133. Erecting Shop: D3067/8, D3371, D3585/7, 13117/68/78, 42542, 44243, 44425, 47321, 47534, 48272/82, 48413, 48669/87, 53808, 73140, 75016. Paint Shop: D163 Leicestershire and Derbyshire Yeomanry, D164, M.R. 1000, 42350, Outside : 43982. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D2508, D5137, 12000, 41168, 42332/63/75, 42448, 43263, 43410/64, 43760, 43825, 43938/85, 44092, 44154, 44561/83, 47218/59, 47310/40, 47601, 48094, 'Spike Island' (Gasworks): Cut up remains of 42387, 44166, 47353 an 47516. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2350
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42350    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
20/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
13/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42350    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev