Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 40 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4955 Week
» 16192 Month
» 249112 Year
» 1914488 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2351 on 06/06/1929
British Railways 42351 w/e 05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 06/06/1929
Withdrawal Sat 25/08/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 11/03/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 06/06/1929
9A   Longsight on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
16D   Mansfield w/e 30/09/1950
11B   Barrow in Furness 4w/e 10/08/1957
1A   Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1957
14D   Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
1A   Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 22/08/1959
1A   Willesden w/e 12/09/1959
1E   Bletchley w/e 07/01/1961
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 24/06/1961
2E   Northampton w/e 25/11/1961
1A   Willesden w/e 03/03/1962
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 30/06/1962
     Withdrawn on 25/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 16D Mansfield w/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 5E Alsager 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 14D Neasden 4w/e 14/06/1958
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 4w/e 04/10/1958
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen 8w/e 05/09/1959
EXLOAN 1A Willesden 3w/e 26/09/1959
ALLOC 1E Bletchley 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 02/12/1961
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/06/1962
WDN   w/e 25/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/07/1950 Derby Works 42146 almost complete; UTA.56 complete and painted; UTA.57 nearly complete. First two sets of frames in position for order No. 4310. Nos. 404, 40411/6, 43364 in store near station, joined a fortnight later by 43342 an 43482. Fresh off Works: 47000, 2035, 43900/61 repainted with emblem; 42503, 43985, 44007, 44200, 47233, 58075, 58234 lettered L.M.S.; 40656, 40925, 41064/96, 42377/93 lined black, with emblem; 40671 'British Railways'; 42311 unlined. In Paint Shop 58054 (ex 1341) with emblem. For shops W/E 15/7/50: 434, 40535, 41051, 41168, 1889, 42351/3, 42406, 3101, 43690, 43892/98, 44112/72, 7342, 58224, 64722, 64951, 4969. Still in Works Yard at end of July: 22853, 3511, 41034, 43297, 43818, 58036, 58229 (condemned). 24/7/50: Ex Works: 2070 still lettered G.W.R. 64827 repainted with emblem; 64903, tender lettered L.N.E.R.; 42503 lettered L.M.S. 30/7/50: 42146, UTA.56/57, Order 4310 as on 13th. Nos. 12070/1 complete, 12072/3 almost complete; 10800 in Diesel shop; 41060 lined with 'British Railways' on tender; 41181 has tender unlined with emblem; 42340 lined black with emblem. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/06/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2351
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Longsight (9A)    
05/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42351    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mansfield (16D)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (11B)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (14D)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
22/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
24/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
03/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
30/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
25/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42351    
11/03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev