Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 249 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5649 Week
» 23701 Month
» 256621 Year
» 1921997 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2355 on 27/06/1929
British Railways 42355 w/e 27/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 27/06/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/11/1963
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 27/06/1929
9C   Macclesfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
12E   Barrow in Furness w/e 10/06/1961
15C   Leicester Midland w/e 25/11/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 30/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 12E Barrow in Furness 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 02/12/1961
WDN   w/e 30/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/09/1949 Manchester London Road Station Fowler 2-6-4T No. 42355 was noted at London Road Statlon on 8/9, painted black and fully lined and with the new crest on the tank sides. Class '4M.T.' No. 43042 was noted in similar livery near Broadheath (Altrincham) on the same date. A smart little piece of running was noted on 6/9 by 'Jubilee' No. 5740 Munster. Although arriving at Stockport on time with the 8.35 a.m. ex-Euston, the slow station work here made a three minutes late departure from the latter. Extremely fast and unchecked running resulted in a three minutes early arrival at London Road, Manchester. SLS/194910
12/07/1961 Derby Works (Erecting Shop) Diesel Erecting Shop: D214/7/36, D2503, D3017, D5034, 13119. Diesel Test House: D41, D100, D230/2, 10203, 11114. New Shunter Test House: D3181, New Building : D38, D43-D49, D139-D141. Finishing Shop: D42, D138, D220. Erecting Shop: D3058, 12069, 13122, 42082, 42178, 42334/55/74/8/85, 42411, 42501/2, 43947, 44053, 44135, 44203, 44598, 47207, 47531, 48011, 48193, 48339. 48729. 73127. New Paint Shop: D39, D40, MR1000, D2501, 42075. 47357, 73067. In Works Sidings : D3016, 12000, 13250, 41532, 41835, 42307/49, 42506/10/23/31, 42697, 43427, 43846, 43905, 44232, 44566, 46150 (returned to its birthplace!), 47268, 47393, 48211, 48312, 48469; 58850, 75050. Bone Yard: Cecil Raikes, 42332, 42507. SLS/196108
14/08/1961 Derby MPD (17A) (Ex Works on Shed) Ex Works on Shed: D42, 42355, 42502, 44232, 44566, 47207. SLS/196109
04/01/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. SLS/196202
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2355
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
27/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42355    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12E)    
25/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
30/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 42355    
12/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev