Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2356 on 02/07/1929
British Railways 42356 w/e 01/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 02/07/1929
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 02/07/1929
9C   Macclesfield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8E   Brunswick 4w/e 22/03/1958
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9G Northwich 4w/e 22/03/1958
WDN   w/e 30/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/03/1962 Derby Works (Works Sidings) Diesel Erecting Shop: D2, D110, D115, D122, D5018/35/75/6/80/6. Test House: D1, D3, D38, D75, D103, D161, D2213. New Building: D164-D173. Finishing Shop: D162/3, D5081/2/9. Erecting Shop: L. & N.W.R. 2650, D3124, 13117, 42089, 42198, 42343/50/85, 43453, 43950/85, 44092, 44262, 47003, 47165, 47336, 47427, 47627/67/74, 48182, 48211, 75035. Paint Shop: D160, 47643, 48490. Works Sidings: ED1, ED3, D123, D2506/8, D2912, D5022/92, D5133, 12000, 41168, 42332/56/63/75/87, 42448, 43410, 47218/59, 47601, 48099, 48442, 58228. Works Shunters: D2380, 47000, 47250. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/07/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2356
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Macclesfield (9C)    
01/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42356    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (8E)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 42356    
03/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev