Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 248 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5648 Week
» 23700 Month
» 256620 Year
» 1921996 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 2358 on 08/07/1929
British Railways 42358 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 08/07/1929
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962
Service Life 33 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Fri 28/12/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/07/1929
5F   Uttoxeter on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5D   Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1957
5F   Uttoxeter 8w/e 05/10/1957
24L   Carnforth w/e 16/06/1962
5D   Stoke w/e 07/07/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 10/11/1945
ALLOC 5F Uttoxeter w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 5F Uttoxeter 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 5w/e 04/08/1962
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/07/1929 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2358
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F)    
12/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42358    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 42358    
28/12/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev