Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 343 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18146 Week
» 71162 Month
» 190689 Year
» 3217542 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
2358 |
on |
08/07/1929 |
British Railways |
42358 |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Fowler |
Class |
4P |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
Sat 08/07/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/10/1962 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
Fri 28/12/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
10/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
w/e |
09/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
ALLOC |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
24L |
Carnforth |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
ALLOC |
5D |
Stoke |
5w/e |
04/08/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/07/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2358 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42358 |
|
|
23/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
05/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (24L) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
27/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42358 |
|
|
28/12/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|